NY S08647 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the duty of the state board of parole in reporting parole statistics; specifies necessary information.
Title
Clarifies the duty of the state board of parole in reporting parole statistics; specifies necessary information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2471 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1615 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02471 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.292