NY S08600 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the provision of opioid treatment services by certain entities including corporations owned by another corporation in order to increase consumer accessibility to opioid treatment services in geographic areas determined by the commissioner to be in need of such services.
Title
Authorizes the provision of opioid treatment services by certain entities including corporations owned by another corporation in order to increase consumer accessibility to opioid treatment services in geographic areas determined by the commissioner to be in need of such services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8600A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1429 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |