NY S08579 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation to conduct a study to identify potential sites along all highways and thruways in the state for wildlife crossings; directs the department of transportation to create a report on the fiscal impact of such study.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation to conduct a study to identify potential sites along all highways and thruways in the state for wildlife crossings; directs the department of transportation to create a report on the fiscal impact of such study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1046 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10533 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to environmental conservation