NY S08568 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of the New York black car operators' injury compensation fund, inc., for an additional three years.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of the New York black car operators' injury compensation fund, inc., for an additional three years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9619 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1373 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09619 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - signed chap.417