NY S08564 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8809B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8809B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain buildings with five or fewer units to convert to cooperative or condominium ownership upon written purchase agreements with at least fifteen percent of the dwelling units in the building.
Title
Permits certain buildings with five or fewer units to convert to cooperative or condominium ownership upon written purchase agreements with at least fifteen percent of the dwelling units in the building.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8809B |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1032 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08809 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - signed chap.696