NY S08561 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9276A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9276A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a ".gov" domain name for websites maintained by a county.
Title
Requires a ".gov" domain name for websites maintained by a county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9276A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.948 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8561A |
2022-03-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09276 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - signed chap.755