NY S08522 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes hunting big game by rifle in the county of Tompkins.
Title
Authorizes hunting big game by rifle in the county of Tompkins.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.152 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.752 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8522 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.75 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.75 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-06 | Senate | print number 8666a |
2020-06-06 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-10-23 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8666A |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.752 |
2020-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08666 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.152