NY S08521 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 8521C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 8521C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of an innovative housing initiative for persons with a developmental disability who wish and are able to safely reside in such a setting; directs the division of housing and community renewal to establish guidelines for the dissemination of disclosure materials for the offer and sale of interests in residential environments formed under the innovative housing initiative; creates an exemption from certain filing requirements for residential environments that are formed as cooperative interests in realty for persons receiving services under the innovative housing initiative.
Title
Relates to the creation of an innovative housing initiative for persons with a developmental disability who wish and are able to safely reside in such a setting; directs the division of housing and community renewal to establish guidelines for the dissemination of disclosure materials for the offer and sale of interests in residential environments formed under the innovative housing initiative; creates an exemption from certain filing requirements for residential environments that are formed as cooperative interests in realty for persons receiving services under the innovative housing initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8521C |
2022-05-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8521B |
2022-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8521A |
2022-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES |
2022-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09492 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES