NY S08519 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes state reimbursement to the Jasper-Troupsburg central school district for the purchase of school buses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes state reimbursement to the Jasper-Troupsburg central school district for the purchase of school buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21Assemblyreferred to education
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2121
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10724 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback