NY S08518 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6165A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6165A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the electric vehicle rights act; provides that a homeowners' association may not adopt or enforce any rules or regulations that would effectively prohibit, or impose unreasonable limitations on, the installation or use of an electric vehicle charging station.
Title
Enacts the electric vehicle rights act; provides that a homeowners' association may not adopt or enforce any rules or regulations that would effectively prohibit, or impose unreasonable limitations on, the installation or use of an electric vehicle charging station.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6165A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1182 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8518A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06165 (Same As) 2022-11-22 - signed chap.627