NY S08498 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10606 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1350 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10606 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - signed chap.76