NY S08497 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to base proportions in assessing units in Nassau county.
Title
Relates to base proportions in assessing units in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.536 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.477 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a9465 |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.782 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09465 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s8497