NY S08492 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing discount programs for low-income senior citizens and individuals with a disability; provides that utilities, water-works corporations, telephone corporations and cable television companies shall create discount programs that provide a 10 percent discount to low-income senior citizens and individuals with a disability; defines terms.
Title
Relates to establishing discount programs for low-income senior citizens and individuals with a disability; provides that utilities, water-works corporations, telephone corporations and cable television companies shall create discount programs that provide a 10 percent discount to low-income senior citizens and individuals with a disability; defines terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8492B |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8492A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.923 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09796 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions