NY S08484 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-13 - SIGNED CHAP.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to licensing restrictions for manufacturers and wholesalers of alcoholic beverages on licensees who sell at retail for on-premises consumption; provides an exemption for 10 Cipriani restaurants; provides for the repeal of certain provisions upon expiration thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to licensing restrictions for manufacturers and wholesalers of alcoholic beverages on licensees who sell at retail for on-premises consumption; provides an exemption for 10 Cipriani restaurants; provides for the repeal of certain provisions upon expiration thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-13SenateSIGNED CHAP.583
2024-12-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-05-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.190
2024-05-30Assemblysubstituted for a9216b
2024-05-29Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-20SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 8484B
2024-05-15SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 8484A
2024-03-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-03-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-03-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.711
2024-02-05SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09216 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - substituted by s8484b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S8484
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08484&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08484
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08484&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08484A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08484&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08484B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S8484#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S8484#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08484&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback