NY S08474 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Convenes an office-based surgery workgroup to make recommendations regarding appropriate reforms or policy changes necessary and in the best interest of the public.
Title
Convenes an office-based surgery workgroup to make recommendations regarding appropriate reforms or policy changes necessary and in the best interest of the public.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1504 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10929 (Same As) 2018-05-29 - referred to health