NY S08472 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8918A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8918A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of law enforcement; includes every non-seasonally appointed sworn member or officer of the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental conservation, a forest ranger in the service of the department of environmental conservation, a police officer in the department of environmental conservation, the regional state park police, and university police officers in such twenty year plan.
Title
Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of law enforcement; includes every non-seasonally appointed sworn member or officer of the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental conservation, a forest ranger in the service of the department of environmental conservation, a police officer in the department of environmental conservation, the regional state park police, and university police officers in such twenty year plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8918A |
2024-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1911 |
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8472A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08918 (Same As) 2024-10-04 - tabled