NY S08472 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the department of transportation shall not require a survey from any fiber optic utility for permitting or continuance of the use and occupancy of a state right of way for the purposes of installing, modifying, relocating, repairing, operating, or maintaining fiber optic facilities, under certain circumstances.
Title
Provides that the department of transportation shall not require a survey from any fiber optic utility for permitting or continuance of the use and occupancy of a state right of way for the purposes of installing, modifying, relocating, repairing, operating, or maintaining fiber optic facilities, under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1562 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8472B |
2022-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8472A |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09894 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to transportation