NY S08470 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes former foster care youth who have been discharged from foster care to return to foster care placement during the COVID-19 state of emergency without requiring such children to file a motion authorizing their return to foster care placement and places a temporary moratorium on aging out of foster care during a state of emergency.
Title
Authorizes former foster care youth who have been discharged from foster care to return to foster care placement during the COVID-19 state of emergency without requiring such children to file a motion authorizing their return to foster care placement and places a temporary moratorium on aging out of foster care during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8470B |
2020-07-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-07-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8470A |
2020-07-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10581 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.50