NY S08454 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Kimberly A. Cooney of the village of Cambridge to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer with the Cambridge-Greenwich Police Department.
Title
Authorizes Kimberly A. Cooney of the village of Cambridge to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer with the Cambridge-Greenwich Police Department.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.535 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.713 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9784 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1810 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09784 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8454