NY S08451 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-04 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-04 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing property values which are exempt from the satisfaction of a money judgement and increases the exemptions in bankruptcy.
Title
Relates to increasing property values which are exempt from the satisfaction of a money judgement and increases the exemptions in bankruptcy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-04 | referred to judiciary | |
2010-08-03 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-08-03 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-08-03 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1436 | |
2010-07-26 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11677 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - referred to judiciary