NY S08449 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary state commission to conduct a feasibility study to evaluate and make recommendations concerning the formation and control of a state public bank; provides if such study finds that the state bank is feasible, the legislature shall consider legislation to create a state public bank for New York.
Title
Establishes a temporary state commission to conduct a feasibility study to evaluate and make recommendations concerning the formation and control of a state public bank; provides if such study finds that the state bank is feasible, the legislature shall consider legislation to create a state public bank for New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2022-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1901 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8449B |
2022-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8449A |
2022-05-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09711 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - print number 9711b