NY S08442 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - PRINT NUMBER 8442B
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - PRINT NUMBER 8442B
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for assessment of activities conducted by the banking institution to support persons, small businesses, minority- and women-owned businesses, and certain not-for-profit corporations affected by the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Title
Provides for assessment of activities conducted by the banking institution to support persons, small businesses, minority- and women-owned businesses, and certain not-for-profit corporations affected by the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8442B |
2020-07-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8442A |
2020-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A10329 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - print number 10329b