NY S08430 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - PRINT NUMBER 8430B
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - PRINT NUMBER 8430B
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "first building permit" for purposes of filing requirements to qualify for an abatement of tax payments for certain industrial and commercial properties located in a city of one million or more persons.
Title
Clarifies the definition of "first building permit" for purposes of filing requirements to qualify for an abatement of tax payments for certain industrial and commercial properties located in a city of one million or more persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8430B |
2020-07-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8430A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10533 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - print number 10533a