NY S08429 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Babylon to establish an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Title
Authorizes the town of Babylon to establish an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.906 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09969 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - referred to local governments