NY S08426 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1451A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1451A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency.
Title
Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1451A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.982 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01451 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - approval memo.35