NY S08419 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "emergency rent relief act of 2020" to establish an interim residential rent relief program.
Title
Enacts the "emergency rent relief act of 2020" to establish an interim residential rent relief program.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.125 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.58 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | substituted for a10522 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.670 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10522 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.125