NY S08402 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.774
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.774
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes owners of plots of land within a mapped subdivision not located on a public road or street to install public water lines across the mapped but unimproved roads of the subdivision for the purpose of supplying their property with water.
Title
Authorizes owners of plots of land within a mapped subdivision not located on a public road or street to install public water lines across the mapped but unimproved roads of the subdivision for the purpose of supplying their property with water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.774 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.635 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9736 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.900 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09736 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - substituted by s8402