NY S08372 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for temporary surrender of the license of a dentist or pharmacist with a drug or alcohol abuse problem, or such other disposition as determined by department of education.
Title
Provides for temporary surrender of the license of a dentist or pharmacist with a drug or alcohol abuse problem, or such other disposition as determined by department of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-01 | SIGNED CHAP.549 | |
2010-09-20 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-30 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-30 | ordered to third reading rules cal.435 | |
2010-06-30 | substituted for a8301c | |
2010-06-29 | referred to higher education | |
2010-06-29 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-29 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-29 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1319 | |
2010-06-25 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08301 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - substituted by s8372