NY S08364 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2021 with the governor, the comptroller, the chair of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, and the authority budget office, on its operations and transactions, complying with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Title
Requires the power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2021 with the governor, the comptroller, the chair of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, and the authority budget office, on its operations and transactions, complying with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09982 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS