NY S08350 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Nassau county assessor to accept an application from NGIP Inc. for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes the Nassau county assessor to accept an application from NGIP Inc. for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.303 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10586 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.741 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8350B |
2020-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8350A |
2020-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10586 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.303