NY S08343 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property from December 1, 2024 to December 1, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property from December 1, 2024 to December 1, 2027.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-08-28SenateSIGNED CHAP.272
2024-08-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-07Assemblyhome rule request
2024-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.626
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a9263
2024-05-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-05-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1043
2024-01-19SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09263 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8343

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback