NY S08326 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the protection of the health, safety and employment rights of employees suffering employment loss as the result of the sale or closure of a nuclear electric generation facility.
Title
Relates to the protection of the health, safety and employment rights of employees suffering employment loss as the result of the sale or closure of a nuclear electric generation facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1732 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |