NY S08309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a new article V-A relating to state government integrity.
Title
Adds a new article V-A relating to state government integrity.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-05-18 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10651 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - opinion referred to judiciary