NY S08305 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.594
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.594
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a certain portion of the state highway system in the village of Caledonia, town of Caledonia, county of Livingston as the "WWII Rapone Brothers Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a certain portion of the state highway system in the village of Caledonia, town of Caledonia, county of Livingston as the "WWII Rapone Brothers Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.594 |
2022-11-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a9351a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED 8305A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1064 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09351 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8305a