NY S08302 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to Watertown city court judges; replaces one full-time judgeship with a part-time judgeship.
Title
Relates to Watertown city court judges; replaces one full-time judgeship with a part-time judgeship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.330 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.855 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8302 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | rules report cal.144 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-22 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10514 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.855 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10514 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - signed chap.330