NY S08282 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for stenographers in the county of Broome; authorizes the district attorney of Broome county to appoint a stenographer residing in the county of Onondaga or in any county of the sixth judicial district.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for stenographers in the county of Broome; authorizes the district attorney of Broome county to appoint a stenographer residing in the county of Onondaga or in any county of the sixth judicial district.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10487 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1604 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10487 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.165