NY S08274 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 8274A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to developing a beekeeper registry program; provides notification of such program to purchasers of bees and beekeeping equipment so purchasers can voluntarily register.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to developing a beekeeper registry program; provides notification of such program to purchasers of bees and beekeeping equipment so purchasers can voluntarily register.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 8274A
2018-06-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-04-25SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A10362 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback