NY S08273 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.480
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the residence of peace officers employed as fire protection inspectors, urban park rangers and traffic enforcement agents level IV by a city with a population over one million; must complete two years of employment with city of New York and reside in New York, Kings, Queens, Bronx, Richmond, Nassau, Westchester, Suffolk, Orange, Rockland or Putnam county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the residence of peace officers employed as fire protection inspectors, urban park rangers and traffic enforcement agents level IV by a city with a population over one million; must complete two years of employment with city of New York and reside in New York, Kings, Queens, Bronx, Richmond, Nassau, Westchester, Suffolk, Orange, Rockland or Putnam county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-30 SIGNED CHAP.480
2010-08-18 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-01 returned to senate
2010-07-01 passed assembly
2010-07-01 ordered to third reading rules cal.550
2010-07-01 substituted for a11394
2010-06-25 referred to governmental operations
2010-06-25 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-25 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-25 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1254
2010-06-18 REFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11394 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - substituted by s8273

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback