NY S08252 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Katonah lake, Kitchawan lake, Oscaleta lake, Rippowam lake, Truesdale lake and Waccabuc lake as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Katonah lake, Kitchawan lake, Oscaleta lake, Rippowam lake, Truesdale lake and Waccabuc lake as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.268 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10443a |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1602 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8252A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10443 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8252a