NY S08247 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption from the Incorporated Village of Hempstead Community Development Agency for the 2020-2021 school taxes and the 2021 general taxes for the property at 40 Byrd Street.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption from the Incorporated Village of Hempstead Community Development Agency for the 2020-2021 school taxes and the 2021 general taxes for the property at 40 Byrd Street.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.944 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09482 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means