NY S08241 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting pregnant women to enroll in the state health insurance exchange at any time without penalty.
Title
Relates to permitting pregnant women to enroll in the state health insurance exchange at any time without penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2022-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.688 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8241A |
2022-03-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2022-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |