NY S08230 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs that the flag be flown at half-staff to commemorate the death of members of the United States armed forces who were residents of New York and were killed in action.
Title
Directs that the flag be flown at half-staff to commemorate the death of members of the United States armed forces who were residents of New York and were killed in action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1349 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08771 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations