NY S08202 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates public data maintained by county and city boards of elections; establishes the New York voting and elections database and institute to maintain a statewide database of voting and election data.
Title
Regulates public data maintained by county and city boards of elections; establishes the New York voting and elections database and institute to maintain a statewide database of voting and election data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1441 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10298 (Same As) 2022-05-13 - referred to election law