NY S08186 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding disability to the equal protection requirement.
Title
Relates to adding disability to the equal protection requirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-04-27 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09546 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary