NY S08179 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to the operation of personal watercraft and specialty prop-craft from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021.
Title
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to the operation of personal watercraft and specialty prop-craft from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10361 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1650 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10361 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.303