NY S08170 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates room three hundred one of the Putnam supreme and county court as the "Judge James F. Reitz Memorial Courtroom".
Title
Designates room three hundred one of the Putnam supreme and county court as the "Judge James F. Reitz Memorial Courtroom".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.712 |
2022-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.324 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted for a8456b |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.579 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08456 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - substituted by s8170