NY S08164 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of unlawful storage of a firearm leading to use in the commission of a crime which is a class E felony.
Title
Establishes the crime of unlawful storage of a firearm leading to use in the commission of a crime which is a class E felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.790 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09573 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - referred to codes