NY S08140 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - PRINT NUMBER 8140B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - PRINT NUMBER 8140B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a COVID-19 emergency rental assistance program; implements a program of rental assistance in the form of emergency vouchers for eligible individuals or families; defines terms.
Title
Establishes a COVID-19 emergency rental assistance program; implements a program of rental assistance in the form of emergency vouchers for eligible individuals or families; defines terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8140B |
2020-07-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8140A |
2020-03-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10248 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - print number 10248b