NY S08138 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offenses of phishing in the third degree, phishing in the second degree and phishing in the first degree; and relates to the time in which prosecution of such offenses must be commenced.
Title
Establishes the offenses of phishing in the third degree, phishing in the second degree and phishing in the first degree; and relates to the time in which prosecution of such offenses must be commenced.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.833 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09843 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes