NY S08130 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-07 - SIGNED CHAP.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits electronic application for absentee ballots and removes requirement that such application be signed by the voter; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits electronic application for absentee ballots and removes requirement that such application be signed by the voter; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-07AssemblySIGNED CHAP.91
2020-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-05-28Assemblypassed assembly
2020-05-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.49
2020-05-28Assemblysubstituted for a10516a
2020-05-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-05-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-05-27SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.644
2020-05-25SenatePRINT NUMBER 8130D
2020-05-25SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2020-05-25SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-05-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 8130C
2020-05-24SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2020-05-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 8130B
2020-05-20SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2020-05-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 8130A
2020-05-19SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2020-03-24SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10516 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - substituted by s8130d

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08130
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08130A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08130B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08130C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08130D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8130#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8130#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08130&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback